|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 24/02/1937 | 03/03/1937 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1937 | 30/07/1937 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1938 | 07/03/1938 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1938 | 10/08/1938 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1939 | 16/01/1939 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1939 | 15/06/1939 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1939 | 02/02/1940 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1940 | 17/12/1940 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1941 | 07/06/1941 | 46 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/12/1942 | 26/02/1943 | 61 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1944 | 03/11/1944 | 74 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A2/2 Boiler number 29770 (Diagram 106A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1945 | 08/07/1945 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/08/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1946 | 12/04/1946 | 39 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/07/1946 | 11/07/1946 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1947 | 14/03/1947 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/08/1947 | 29/08/1947 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1948 | 12/03/1948 | 45 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E504 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1948 | 23/03/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR 60504 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/03/1949 | 30/04/1949 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1950 | 26/05/1950 | 138 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1950 | 26/09/1950 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1951 | 19/04/1951 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1951 | 09/01/1952 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1952 | 03/03/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1952 | 03/04/1952 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1952 | 29/12/1952 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1953 | 15/06/1953 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1953 | 16/11/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29771 (Diagram 106A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1954 | 17/02/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1954 | 21/12/1954 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1955 | 15/07/1955 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1955 | 11/08/1955 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1955 | 03/10/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1955 | 12/10/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1955 | 10/01/1956 | 47 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1957 | 12/02/1957 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1957 | 21/11/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1958 | 25/07/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1959 | 02/10/1959 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1961 | 23/01/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
29/01/1961 | New England | 60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. | SLS/196103 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/07/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2004, name: MONS MEG Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1839 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 106 boiler fitted |
||
24/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1937. Dep: 03/03/1937. | ||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 30/07/1937. | ||
27/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1938. Dep: 07/03/1938. | ||
03/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1938. Dep: 10/08/1938. | ||
10/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1939. Dep: 16/01/1939. | ||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 15/06/1939. | ||
06/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1939. Dep: 02/02/1940. | ||
07/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1940. Dep: 17/12/1940. | ||
23/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1941. Dep: 07/06/1941. | ||
28/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/12/1942. Dep: 26/02/1943. | ||
22/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/08/1944. Dep: 03/11/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A2/2 Boiler number 29770 (Diagram 106A) |
||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 08/07/1945. | ||
13/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. | ||
16/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 993 but not taken up | ||
05/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1946. Dep: 12/04/1946. | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 504 | ||
11/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/07/1946. Dep: 11/07/1946. | ||
03/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1947. Dep: 14/03/1947. | ||
27/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1947. Dep: 29/08/1947. | ||
28/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1948. Dep: 12/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E504 |
||
14/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1948. Dep: 23/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60504 |
||
22/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/03/1949. Dep: 30/04/1949. | ||
09/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950. | ||
21/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 26/09/1950. | ||
20/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951. | ||
26/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 09/01/1952. | ||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 03/03/1952. | ||
16/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952. | ||
01/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1952. Dep: 29/12/1952. | ||
14/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1953. Dep: 15/06/1953. | ||
07/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1953. Dep: 16/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29771 (Diagram 106A) |
||
10/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1954. Dep: 17/02/1954. | ||
17/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1954. Dep: 21/12/1954. | ||
01/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1955. Dep: 15/07/1955. | ||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 11/08/1955. | ||
18/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1955. Dep: 03/10/1955. | ||
07/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. | ||
12/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/10/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955. | ||
25/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1955. Dep: 10/01/1956. | ||
24/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1957. Dep: 12/02/1957. | ||
10/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. | ||
19/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957. | ||
16/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/07/1958. Dep: 25/07/1958. | ||
12/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/06/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. | ||
22/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1959. Dep: 02/10/1959. | ||
23/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60504 from New England (34E) | ||
23/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/01/1961. Dep: 23/01/1961. |