Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 21215 Month
» 269508 Year
» 1153889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1052 m/e 11/1902
LNER (1924) 6052   01/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3200   07/09/1946
BR 63200 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1902
Q4/201/11/1924
Q4/128/12/1946
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Works Number 6251
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Mon 05/09/1949 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 24/07/1919
MEX Mexborough 16/02/1924
CLK Colwick 01/01/1931
LNG Langwith Junction 09/01/1931
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
ARD Ardsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 05/09/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 05/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 335)
07/01/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
04/01/1908 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
25/11/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1267)
30/06/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 478)
05/08/1922 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 854)
01/11/1924 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 592)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
10/08/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 468)
14/05/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 891)
17/11/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1634)
06/02/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
08/07/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 830)
29/04/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 185)
28/12/1946 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3767)
09/10/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 913)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 01/1907   General  
Gorton Works 1908 04/01/1908   General
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1911 25/11/1911   General
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 30/06/1917   General
Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1922 05/08/1922 113 days General
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1924 01/11/1924 113 days General
Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6052
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1927 16/04/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 29/06/1929 10/08/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1932 14/05/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1934 17/11/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1937 06/02/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1939 08/07/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1941 20/12/1941 36 days General  
Gorton Works 22/04/1944 29/04/1944 8 days Heavy
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1946 28/12/1946 22 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 3767 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1948 09/10/1948 8 days Heavy
New cylinders
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63200
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as GCR Number 1052
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6251
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: ?/01/1907.    
07/01/1907 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 336 boiler fitted    
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 04/01/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 25/11/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 30/06/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/07/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
15/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1922. Dep: 05/08/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6052
   
26/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
29/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
01/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
30/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Dep: 17/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941.    
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
22/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3200    
07/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 3767 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
02/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63200
   
05/09/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 63200 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev