Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3125 Week
» 14696 Month
» 262989 Year
» 1147370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1053 m/e 11/1902
LNER (1924) 6053   12/04/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1902
Q4/224/11/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Works Number 6252
To Service During 11/1902 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Tue 28/02/1939 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 11/1902
LNG Langwith Junction 24/11/1936
BRN Barnsley 11/10/1937
   Withdrawn 28/02/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
15/12/1906 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 237)
20/03/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1385)
31/01/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1138)
19/04/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1377)
12/04/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 468A)
24/11/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 911)
03/10/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 591)
19/01/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 595)
07/08/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 319)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1906 15/12/1906   General
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1909 20/03/1909   General
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1914 31/01/1914   General
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 19/04/1919   General
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1921 13/08/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/11/1923 12/04/1924 148 days General
Boiler number 468A (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6053
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1926 04/09/1926 71 days General  
Gorton Works 27/10/1928 24/11/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1931 03/10/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1935 19/01/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 07/08/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as GCR Number 1053
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6252
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1906 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1906. Dep: 15/12/1906.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 20/03/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 31/01/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 19/04/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
18/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1921. Dep: 13/08/1921.    
17/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1923. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 468A (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6053
   
26/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926.    
27/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
29/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 19/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
28/02/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 6053 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev