Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 10 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6225 Week
» 17930 Month
» 349419 Year
» 426006 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1054 y/e 1902
LNER (1924) 6054   14/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3201   17/08/1946
BR 63201 w/e 16/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/11902
Q4/227/01/1923
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Works Number 6253
To Service During y/e 1902
Withdrawal Mon 22/01/1951 off Barnsley (36D)
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 27/1/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 19/06/1908
DON Doncaster 30/01/1930
MEX Mexborough 08/02/1930
LNG Langwith Junction 06/01/1931
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
GRA Grantham 28/09/1946
BRN Barnsley 13/02/1949
   Withdrawn 22/01/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRN Barnsley w/e 19/02/1949
WDN   22/01/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 337)
26/01/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 214)
04/03/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 845)
06/07/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1114)
18/08/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 846)
27/01/1923 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1401)
07/12/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 601)
07/12/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
25/06/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)
17/11/1934 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 836)
10/04/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)
11/11/1939 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 920)
21/03/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 185)
08/04/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
17/08/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3734)
08/11/1947 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
16/04/1949 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 26/01/1907   General
Boiler number 214 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1910 04/03/1910   General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 06/07/1912   General
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 18/08/1917   General
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1922 27/01/1923 162 days General
Boiler number 1401 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1924 14/06/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6054
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1927 18/06/1927 78 days General  
Gorton Works 02/11/1929 07/12/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1932 25/06/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1934 17/11/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 10/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1939 11/11/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1942 21/03/1942 18 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1944 08/04/1944 23 days General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1945 17/02/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/07/1946 17/08/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3201
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1947 10/05/1947 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1947 08/11/1947 8 days Heavy
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1949 16/04/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63201
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1902 To Service To service as GCR Number 1054
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6253
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 26/01/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 214 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/06/1908 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 04/03/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 06/07/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 18/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1401 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6054
   
02/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927.    
02/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
30/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Dep: 17/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
17/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1944. Dep: 08/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945.    
27/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3201
   
28/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
26/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
01/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/11/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
13/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
02/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1949. Dep: 16/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63201
   
22/01/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63201 from Barnsley (36D)    

prev prev