Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 56 m/e 09/1903
LNER (1924) 5056   14/03/1925
LNER (1946) 3202   18/04/1946
BR 63202 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/109/1903
Q4/220/04/1946
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4202
To Service During 09/1903 to Barnsley (BRN)
Withdrawal Tue 25/09/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 48 yrs , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 25/9/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRN Barnsley (New) m/e 09/1903
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 09/05/1929
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/06/1929
BRN Barnsley 07/04/1933
GRA Grantham 06/03/1949
37A Ardsley 04/06/1950
   Withdrawn 25/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 37A Ardsley m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   25/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 837)
07/07/1907 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
17/08/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 837)
18/08/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1696)
03/03/1923 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1402)
10/12/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
22/10/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 898)
22/12/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 829)
03/07/1937 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 836)
18/05/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1920)
28/08/1943 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
20/04/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)
18/12/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 875)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 1 day General  
Gorton Works 1909 11/1909   General  
Gorton Works 1912 17/08/1912   General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 18/08/1917   General
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1923 03/03/1923 57 days General
Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1925 14/03/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5056
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1927 10/12/1927 78 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1930 26/07/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 15/10/1932 22/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 898 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1934 22/12/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1937 03/07/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1940 18/05/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1943 28/08/1943 20 days General
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1946 20/04/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3202
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1948 18/12/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63202
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 56
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4202
Allocated to Barnsley (BRN)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907.    
07/07/1907 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 851 boiler fitted    
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/11/1909.    
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 17/08/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 18/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1923. Dep: 03/03/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
24/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1925. Dep: 14/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5056
   
24/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
09/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
03/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
21/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930.    
15/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 898 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/04/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
15/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
27/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 20/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3202
   
27/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63202
   
06/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
25/09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63202 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev