Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 920 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3059 Week
» 13229 Month
» 291025 Year
» 1175406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 57 m/e 09/1903
LNER (1924) 5057   10/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3203   18/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/109/1903
Q4/225/04/1914
Q4/107/09/1940
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4203
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal Mon 06/11/1950 off Barnsley (36D)
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/ll/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 10/11/1916
KEA Keadby m/e 1922
IMM Immingham 30/10/1930
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 09/08/1943
NWE New England 12/12/1943
NWE New England (M&GNR) 27/08/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 01/11/1945
BRN Barnsley 07/04/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 06/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
WDN   06/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)
22/05/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 861)
25/04/1914 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 860)
28/08/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1911)
26/06/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
27/09/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1632)
25/02/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 148)
02/11/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 875)
21/05/1938 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1682)
07/09/1940 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 530)
01/05/1943 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 894)
10/11/1945 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 893)
13/12/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3725)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1909 22/05/1909   General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1914 25/04/1914   General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1920 28/08/1920   General
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1922 06/01/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 10/05/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5057
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1925 26/06/1926 197 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1928 22/09/1928 50 days General
New R.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1930 27/09/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1933 25/02/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1935 02/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1938 21/05/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 07/09/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1943 01/05/1943 44 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1945 10/11/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1947 13/12/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 57
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4203
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 22/05/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 25/04/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/11/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 28/08/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1922 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
28/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1922. Dep: 06/01/1923.    
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5057
   
12/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1925. Dep: 26/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
23/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE) (M&GNR)    
20/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3203    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
22/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 13/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3203 from Barnsley (36D)    

prev prev