Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 58 m/e 10/1903
LNER (1924) 5058   27/02/1926
LNER (1946) 9925   24/11/1946
BR 69925   03/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1903
Q4/226/01/1929
Q1/125/06/1942
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4204
To Service During 10/1903 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Fri 13/08/1954 off Eastfield (65A)
Service Life 50 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 10/1903
DON Doncaster 19/05/1925
MAR March 04/01/1927
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28/02/1929
BRN Barnsley 28/04/1934
FRO Frodingham 11/07/1942
LNG Langwith Junction 09/11/1942
EFD Eastfield 26/08/1943
   Withdrawn 13/08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   13/08/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
11/05/1907 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)
22/06/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1112)
22/09/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1646)
26/01/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 589)
26/01/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
17/01/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1677)
17/06/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)
29/02/1936 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
11/03/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 916)
25/06/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 916)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 11/05/1907   General
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1912 22/06/1912   General
Returned to UK 9/7/19
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1919 06/09/1919 43 days General
New L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1921 04/06/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 31/03/1923 22/09/1923 176 days General
Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1925 27/02/1926 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5058
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1928 26/01/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1930 17/01/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 17/06/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1936 29/02/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1939 11/03/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 916 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 1 day Unclassified
Boiler examination only
 
Doncaster Works 24/01/1942 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 4/4/42
 
Cowlairs Works 26/03/1945 18/04/1945 24 days General  
Cowlairs Works 05/02/1946 09/02/1946 5 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 27/02/1946 28/02/1946 2 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 24/12/1947 10/01/1948 18 days General  
Cowlairs Works 30/01/1951 03/03/1951 33 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 69925
 
Cowlairs Works 12/03/1951 17/03/1951 6 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 58
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4204
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 11/05/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 22/06/1912.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 9/7/19
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1919. Dep: 06/09/1919.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
   
16/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1921. Dep: 04/06/1921.    
31/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1925. Dep: 27/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5058
   
04/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
01/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 26/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
28/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
20/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/04/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
22/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 29/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
04/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 916 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler examination only
   
24/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 24/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 4/4/42
   
25/06/1942 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 22997 boiler fitted    
25/06/1942 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 916 boiler fitted    
11/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
09/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
26/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
26/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1945. Dep: 18/04/1945.    
05/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.    
27/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1946. Dep: 28/02/1946.    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9925    
24/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948.    
30/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 69925
   
12/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951.    
13/08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69925 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev