Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 152 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 152 Week
» 18934 Month
» 267227 Year
» 1151608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 59 m/e 10/1903
LNER (1924) 5059   23/05/1925
LNER (1946) 3204   18/08/1946
BR 63204 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1903
Q4/213/02/1915
Q4/123/01/1943
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4205
To Service During 10/1903 to Barnsley (BRN)
Withdrawal Mon 25/06/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 47 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Tablet exchange apparatus fitted at Grantham shed, April 1949
Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRN Barnsley (New) m/e 10/1903
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
GRA Grantham 13/02/1949
37A Ardsley 11/06/1950
   Withdrawn 25/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   25/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 840)
04/12/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 858)
13/02/1915 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1372)
25/12/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1375)
21/01/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 894)
20/10/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
09/07/1932 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 836)
09/06/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 643)
20/02/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1916)
21/10/1939 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 840)
23/01/1943 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 19)
17/11/1945 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 894)
06/11/1948 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3772)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1909 04/12/1909   General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1915 13/02/1915   General
New cylinders
Boiler number 1372 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1920 25/12/1920   General
Boiler number 1375 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1923 17/02/1923 43 days General  
Gorton Works 14/02/1925 23/05/1925 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5059
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 21/01/1928 64 days General
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1928 20/10/1928 22 days Light Repair
New R.H. cylinder
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1928 19/09/1929 272 days Light Repair
New L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1930 27/09/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 09/07/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1934 09/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1937 20/02/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1939 21/10/1939 15 days General
To be photographed for Press picture of a new O2 (3834) with a secondhand tender to save steel in wa
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1943 23/01/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1945 17/11/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1948 06/11/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3772 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63204
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 59
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4205
Allocated to Barnsley (BRN)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 04/12/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 13/02/1915.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 1372 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 25/12/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1375 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1923. Dep: 17/02/1923.    
14/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1925. Dep: 23/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5059
   
19/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
29/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 20/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
22/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 19/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
   
16/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930.    
18/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
26/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
To be photographed for Press picture of a new O2 (3834) with a secondhand tender to save steel in wa
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1943. Dep: 23/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3204    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3772 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63204
   
13/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
11/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
25/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63204 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev