Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 418 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1355 Week
» 8539 Month
» 316520 Year
» 1200901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 64 m/e 10/1903
LNER (1924) 5064   15/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3205   15/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1903
Q4/217/07/1915
Q4/115/05/1943
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4206
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Tue 26/12/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 30/12/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 14/12/1903
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/10/1926
DON Doncaster 15/12/1926
MEX Mexborough m/e 1928
ANN Annesley 05/01/1931
ARD Ardsley 28/12/1935
   Withdrawn 26/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   26/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1903 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
19/10/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 845)
05/02/1910 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
17/07/1915 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1410)
14/08/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1373)
26/11/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
11/02/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1911)
29/06/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)
19/02/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 906)
12/10/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 138)
15/05/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 876)
15/09/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 913)
27/12/1947 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3771)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 19/10/1907   General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1910 05/02/1910   General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1915 17/07/1915   General
Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 14/08/1920   General
Boiler number 1373 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1922 07/10/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 14/06/1924 15/11/1924 155 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5064
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 26/11/1927 106 days General
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1930 17/05/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 28/01/1933 11/02/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1935 29/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1938 19/02/1938 15 days General
Secondhand L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1940 12/10/1940 43 days General
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1943 15/05/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 15/09/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1947 27/12/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3771 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 64
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4206
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
14/12/1903 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 19/10/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 05/02/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 17/07/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 14/08/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1373 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 07/10/1922.    
14/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5064
   
15/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
15/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
19/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930.    
05/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
28/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
05/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Secondhand L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3205    
06/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3771 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3205 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev