Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 65 m/e 10/1903
LNER (1924) 5065   22/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3206   03/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1903
Q4/229/11/1941
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4207
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Sat 26/02/1949 off Grantham (GRA)
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 14/03/1910
DON Doncaster 19/05/1925
MAR March 15/07/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 02/03/1929
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 16/03/1929
GRA Grantham 28/09/1946
   Withdrawn 26/02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GRA Grantham 26/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 842)
24/08/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1265)
06/10/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 863)
22/11/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1678)
12/04/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 530)
08/10/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
16/03/1935 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
16/03/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 328)
14/08/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 442)
09/1937 Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
13/01/1940 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 54)
29/11/1941 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
29/11/1941 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
11/03/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 891)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1912 24/08/1912   General
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 06/10/1917   General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1922 18/11/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 06/09/1924 22/11/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5065
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1930 12/04/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1932 08/10/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1935 16/03/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 328 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1937 14/08/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1939 13/01/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1941 18/01/1941 15 days Light Repair
After derailment
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1941 29/11/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1944 11/03/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1946 01/02/1947 43 days General  
Gorton Works 07/01/1948 25/02/1948 50 days General
New R.H. cylinder
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 65
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4207
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
14/03/1910 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 24/08/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 06/10/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
23/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922.    
06/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1924. Dep: 22/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5065
   
19/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
22/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 328 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
07/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
   
30/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
15/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
21/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3206    
21/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947.    
07/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1948. Dep: 25/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
   
26/02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3206 from Grantham (GRA)    

prev prev