Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 418 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1355 Week
» 8539 Month
» 316520 Year
» 1200901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 67 m/e 10/1903
LNER (1924) 5067   07/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3207   17/10/1946
BR 63207 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1903
Q4/221/09/1929
Q4/104/01/1947
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4208
To Service During 10/1903
Withdrawal Mon 07/08/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 12/8/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 14/12/1903
CLK Colwick 02/01/1931
ANN Annesley 09/01/1931
LNG Langwith Junction 14/04/1936
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
GRA Grantham 28/09/1946
37A Ardsley 11/06/1950
   Withdrawn 07/08/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 30/06/1950
WDN 37A Ardsley 07/08/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 843)
20/02/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 860)
20/12/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 855)
26/07/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1138)
07/06/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 530)
21/09/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
21/09/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 525)
27/08/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
02/02/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
16/01/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 830)
20/05/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
31/01/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 145)
19/02/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3732)
04/01/1947 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3768)
26/03/1949 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3773)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1909 20/02/1909   General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1913 20/12/1913   General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 26/07/1919   General
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1921 08/10/1921 78 days General  
Gorton Works 29/12/1923 07/06/1924 162 days General
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5067
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1927 12/03/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 10/08/1929 21/09/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1932 27/08/1932 15 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 02/02/1935 15 days General
O4 chimney fitted
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 16/01/1937 17 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1939 20/05/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1941 31/01/1942 32 days General
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1944 19/02/1944 24 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1946 04/01/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3768 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1949 26/03/1949 8 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 3773 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63207
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1950 1 day Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 67
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4208
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
14/12/1903 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 20/02/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 20/12/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 26/07/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
23/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921.    
29/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 07/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5067
   
15/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1927. Dep: 12/03/1927.    
10/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
02/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
13/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
O4 chimney fitted
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1941. Dep: 31/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
27/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
17/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3207    
14/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3768 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3773 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63207
   
03/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/06/1950.    
11/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
07/08/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 63207 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev