Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 68 m/e 11/1903
LNER (1924) 5068   31/12/1925
LNER (1946) 3208   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9934   07/04/1946
BR 69934   12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1903
Q4/227/12/1941
Q1/206/09/1944
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4209
To Service During 11/1903 to Barnsley (BRN)
Withdrawal Thu 20/08/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 55 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 22/8/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRN Barnsley (New) m/e 11/1903
MEX Mexborough 06/10/1944
DON Doncaster 25/08/1946
FRO Frodingham 26/09/1946
   Withdrawn 20/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   20/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 844)
09/03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 337)
23/12/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1269)
09/02/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1268)
31/12/1925 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1832)
26/05/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 418)
25/03/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 530)
10/08/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 418)
30/04/1938 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
27/12/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3733)
06/09/1944 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3750)
12/06/1948 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3766)
31/03/1951 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22982)
19/12/1953 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22981)
29/09/1956 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22986)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 09/03/1907   General
Boiler number 337 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1911 23/12/1911   General
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1918 09/02/1918   General
Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1922 17/03/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 21/11/1925 31/12/1925 41 days General
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5068
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1928 26/05/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1930 28/06/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 25/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1935 10/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1938 30/04/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1941 27/12/1941 32 days General
Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 21/06/1944 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 5/8/44.
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 12/06/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3766 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69934
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1951 31/03/1951 46 days General
Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1953 19/12/1953 38 days General
Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1956 29/09/1956 98 days General
Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1956 17/10/1956 17 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 68
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4209
Allocated to Barnsley (BRN)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 09/03/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 337 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 23/12/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 09/02/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 17/03/1923.    
21/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5068
   
21/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
31/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 28/06/1930.    
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 21/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 5/8/44.
   
06/09/1944 Modification Diagram 17A number 3750 boiler fitted    
06/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3208 but not taken up    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9934    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3766 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69934
   
14/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A)
   
12/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A)
   
24/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A)
   
01/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 17/10/1956.    
20/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69934 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev