|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1907 | 09/03/1907 | General | Boiler number 337 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1911 | 23/12/1911 | General | Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1918 | 09/02/1918 | General | Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1922 | 17/03/1923 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5068 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1928 | 26/05/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1930 | 28/06/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 25/03/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1935 | 10/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1938 | 30/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1941 | 27/12/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1944 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Gorton 5/8/44. |
|||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3766 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69934 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1951 | 31/03/1951 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1956 | 29/09/1956 | 98 days | General | Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1956 | 17/10/1956 | 17 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/01/1959 | Frodingham MPD | Following the extensive use of diesel shunters here, the 5 Q1 0-8-0Ts allocated are now in store (69928/9/34/5/6). | SLS/195903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 68 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4209 Allocated to Barnsley (BRN) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 09/03/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 337 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 23/12/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 09/02/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
16/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 17/03/1923. | ||
21/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5068 |
||
21/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
31/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 28/06/1930. | ||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
27/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
26/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
21/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 21/06/1944. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Gorton 5/8/44. |
||
06/09/1944 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 3750 boiler fitted | ||
06/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3208 but not taken up | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9934 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3766 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69934 |
||
14/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A) |
||
12/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A) |
||
24/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A) |
||
01/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 17/10/1956. | ||
20/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69934 from Frodingham (36C) |