Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 214 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 214 Week
» 11785 Month
» 260078 Year
» 1144459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 70 m/e 11/1903
LNER (1924) 5070   12/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3209   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9929   04/05/1946
BR 69929   02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1903
Q4/209/11/1935
Q1/213/11/1943
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4210
To Service During 11/1903 to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Withdrawal Fri 28/08/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 55 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) m/e 11/1903
BRN Barnsley 03/05/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 08/01/1930
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 25/02/1930
LNG Langwith Junction 19/12/1943
IMM Immingham 09/05/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 15/10/1944
36C Frodingham 15/06/1958
   Withdrawn 28/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 14/07/1958
WDN   28/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 845)
07/10/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 854)
19/10/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1268)
10/01/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1829)
26/03/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1817)
04/05/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 438)
29/04/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1829)
09/11/1935 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
09/11/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 876)
31/12/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
10/01/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 643)
13/11/1943 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3744)
04/05/1946 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3763)
02/10/1948 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3739)
25/08/1951 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22986)
15/10/1955 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22989)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 10/1907   General  
Gorton Works 1912 19/10/1912   General
Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 10/01/1920   General
Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1921 01/04/1922 99 days General  
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 12/04/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5070
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1926 26/03/1927 120 days General
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 04/05/1929 15 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 29/11/1930 36 days General
New R.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1933 29/04/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1935 09/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1937 31/12/1937 14 days General
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 30/03/1940 36 days General  
Gorton Works 12/12/1941 10/01/1942 30 days General
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 06/09/1943 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Woodford on 6/ll/43 for use as a water carrier
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1946 04/05/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9929
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1948 02/10/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3739 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69929
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1951 25/08/1951 61 days General
Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1955 15/10/1955 66 days General
Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 70
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4210
Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: ?/10/1907.    
07/10/1907 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 854 boiler fitted    
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 19/10/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1268 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 10/01/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1921. Dep: 01/04/1922.    
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5070
   
03/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1926. Dep: 26/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
08/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
25/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
25/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
   
15/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
18/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.    
12/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 06/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Woodford on 6/ll/43 for use as a water carrier
   
13/11/1943 Modification Diagram 17A number 3744 boiler fitted    
19/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
09/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
15/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3209 but not taken up    
30/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9929
   
04/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3739 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69929
   
26/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 25/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22986 (Diagram 17A)
   
11/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A)
   
15/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
28/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69929 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev