Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 414 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1351 Week
» 8535 Month
» 316516 Year
» 1200897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 71 m/e 11/1903
LNER (1924) 5071   14/08/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1903
Q4/213/08/1921
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4211
To Service During 11/1903 to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Withdrawal Wed 07/06/1939 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 35 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) (New) m/e 11/1903
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 29/06/1929
BRN Barnsley 08/01/1930
   Withdrawn 07/06/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 846)
30/11/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 855)
20/09/1913 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
30/06/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1691)
13/08/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1370)
08/06/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 591)
15/08/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1842)
15/08/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
07/07/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 837)
03/10/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 647)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 30/11/1907   General
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1913 20/09/1913   General
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1917 30/06/1917   General
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1921 13/08/1921 50 days General
Boiler number 1370 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1923 18/08/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 19/06/1926 14/08/1926 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5071
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1929 08/06/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1931 15/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1934 07/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1936 03/10/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 71
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4211
Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 30/11/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 855 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 20/09/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 30/06/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1921. Dep: 13/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1370 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1923. Dep: 18/08/1923.    
19/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1926. Dep: 14/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5071
   
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
29/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
08/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
25/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
23/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/06/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 5071 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev