Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 525 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 21214 Month
» 269507 Year
» 1153888 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 85 m/e 11/1903
LNER (1924) 5085   05/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3210   03/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1903
Q4/214/05/1932
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4212
To Service During 11/1903
Withdrawal Mon 10/10/1949 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 05/05/1916
KEA Keadby m/e 10/1922
IMM Immingham 29/10/1929
KEA Keadby 11/06/1932
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
IMM Immingham 13/09/1939
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 09/08/1943
ARD Ardsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 10/10/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 05/10/1947
WDN ARD Ardsley 10/10/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
11/01/1908 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
21/01/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 866)
07/02/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1368)
24/05/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1265)
05/04/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 438)
03/11/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 54)
26/10/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
14/05/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)
02/03/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1841)
02/03/1935 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
25/09/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
06/04/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 370)
23/05/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 642)
15/08/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 908)
15/02/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3732)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 11/01/1908   General
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1911 21/01/1911   General
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1914 07/02/1914   General
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 24/05/1919   General
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1921 08/10/1921 106 days General  
Gorton Works 24/11/1923 05/04/1924 134 days General
Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5085
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1926 30/10/1926 71 days General  
Gorton Works 22/09/1928 03/11/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1929 26/10/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 14/05/1932 36 days General
Secondhand R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1935 02/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1937 25/09/1937 29 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1940 06/04/1940 50 days General
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1942 23/05/1942 13 days General
After collision
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 15/08/1944 18 days General
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1945 01/09/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 11/01/1947 15/02/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 85
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4212
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 11/01/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 21/01/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 07/02/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/05/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 24/05/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921.    
10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
24/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5085
   
21/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926.    
22/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
29/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Secondhand R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
23/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
28/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
17/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
29/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 15/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3210    
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/10/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3210 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev