Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 946 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 7101 Week
» 17271 Month
» 295067 Year
» 1179448 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 86 m/e 11/1903
LNER (1924) 5086   16/02/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4213
To Service During 11/1903 to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Withdrawal Sat 10/04/1937 off Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) (New) m/e 11/1903
   Withdrawn 10/04/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
16/11/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 862)
10/07/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 237)
18/11/1911 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
24/03/1917 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1678)
16/02/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 370)
05/10/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1646)
27/08/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1822)
17/08/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 530)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 16/11/1907   General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1909 10/07/1909   General
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1911 18/11/1911   General
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1917 24/03/1917   General
Returned to UK 5/6/19
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1919 30/08/1919 50 days General  
Gorton Works 16/07/1921 15/10/1921 92 days General  
Gorton Works 15/12/1923 16/02/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5086
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1926 28/08/1926 50 days General  
Gorton Works 14/09/1929 05/10/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1932 27/08/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 17/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 86
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4213
Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 16/11/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 10/07/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 18/11/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 24/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 5/6/19
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1919. Dep: 30/08/1919.    
16/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921.    
15/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5086
   
10/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1926. Dep: 28/08/1926.    
14/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/04/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5086 from Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    

prev prev