Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 91 m/e 11/1903
LNER (1924) 5091   23/02/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1903
Q4/213/10/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4215
To Service During 11/1903 to Barnsley (BRN)
Withdrawal Wed 17/11/1937 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 34 yrs , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRN Barnsley (New) m/e 11/1903
   Withdrawn 17/11/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)
26/12/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 844)
28/03/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 866)
31/03/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1679)
13/10/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 906)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
28/02/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 892)
05/08/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 907)
30/03/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 26/12/1908   General
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1914 28/03/1914   General
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 31/03/1917   General
Returned to UK 19/4/19
Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1919 19/07/1919 50 days General  
Gorton Works 11/06/1921 27/08/1921 78 days General  
Gorton Works 18/08/1923 23/02/1924 190 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5091
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1926 27/02/1926 43 days General  
Gorton Works 15/09/1928 13/10/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1931 28/02/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 892 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 05/08/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1935 30/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 91
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4215
Allocated to Barnsley (BRN)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 26/12/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 28/03/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 31/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 19/4/19
Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
31/05/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1919. Dep: 19/07/1919.    
11/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1921. Dep: 27/08/1921.    
18/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1923. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5091
   
16/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1926. Dep: 27/02/1926.    
15/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
07/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 892 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/11/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5091 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev