|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1907 | 09/02/1907 | General | Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1910 | 23/04/1910 | General | Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1920 | 25/09/1920 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1923 | 17/03/1923 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1925 | 21/11/1925 | 64 days | General | New cylinders Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5092 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1928 | 30/06/1928 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1929 | 28/12/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1932 | 12/11/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1935 | 18/05/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1937 | 13/11/1937 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1941 | 24/01/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 20 days | General | New cylinders Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 92 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4216 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 09/02/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 23/04/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
03/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1920. Dep: 25/09/1920. | ||
30/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 17/03/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
02/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
19/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925. Work undertaken: New cylinders Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5092 |
||
12/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
30/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929. | ||
05/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
27/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
30/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937. | ||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
26/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1941. Dep: 24/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
31/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
06/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. Work undertaken: New cylinders Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
26/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3212 | ||
14/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/05/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3212 from Barnsley (BRN) |