Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 523 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2430 Week
» 21212 Month
» 269505 Year
» 1153886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 92 m/e 11/1903
LNER (1924) 5092   21/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3212   26/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1903
Q4/217/03/1923
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4216
To Service During 11/1903
Withdrawal Mon 23/05/1949 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 45 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 30/08/1921
STV Staveley (G.C.) 02/02/1924
BRN Barnsley 31/08/1943
LNG Langwith Junction 22/09/1944
BRN Barnsley 07/04/1946
   Withdrawn 23/05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN BRN Barnsley 23/05/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1903 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
09/02/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 478)
23/04/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1111)
17/03/1923 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1408)
30/06/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
12/11/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 920)
18/05/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 319)
24/07/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 920)
30/09/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 185)
24/01/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3734)
25/12/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)
05/10/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3728)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 09/02/1907   General
Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1910 23/04/1910   General
Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1920 25/09/1920 85 days General  
Gorton Works 20/01/1923 17/03/1923 57 days General
Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1925 21/11/1925 64 days General
New cylinders
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5092
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1928 30/06/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1929 28/12/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 05/11/1932 12/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1935 18/05/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 24/07/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1937 13/11/1937 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/09/1939 30/09/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1941 24/01/1942 30 days General
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1943 25/12/1943 20 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1946 05/10/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1903 To Service To service as GCR Number 92
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4216
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 09/02/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 23/04/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1111 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1920. Dep: 25/09/1920.    
30/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 17/03/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
02/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
19/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5092
   
12/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
30/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929.    
05/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
30/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937.    
16/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
26/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1941. Dep: 24/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
06/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
26/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3212    
14/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3212 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev