Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 529 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 21218 Month
» 269511 Year
» 1153892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 135 m/e 01/1904
LNER (1924) 5135   27/03/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4217
To Service During 01/1904 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Thu 10/06/1937 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 01/1904
MAR March 31/01/1927
ARD Ardsley 04/01/1929
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 16/03/1929
ARD Ardsley 23/04/1934
   Withdrawn 10/06/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
28/01/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 857)
14/12/1912 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
17/02/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
11/08/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 19)
15/12/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 328)
10/11/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 442)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 28/01/1908   General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 14/12/1912   General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1917 17/02/1917   General
Returned to UK 5/4/19
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 26/07/1919   General  
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 07/05/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1923 11/08/1923 106 days General
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1926 27/03/1926 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5135
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1928 15/12/1928 71 days General
Boiler number 328 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1931 02/05/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 27/10/1934 10/11/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 135
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4217
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 28/01/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 14/12/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 17/02/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 5/4/19
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 26/07/1919.    
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 07/05/1921.    
28/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
23/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5135
   
31/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
06/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1928. Dep: 15/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 328 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
28/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931.    
23/04/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
27/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/06/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5135 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev