Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 139 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3282 Week
» 13452 Month
» 291248 Year
» 1175629 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 136 m/e 01/1904
LNER (1924) 5136   26/12/1925
LNER (1946) 3213   10/02/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/101/1904
Q4/215/01/1921
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4218
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal Mon 19/06/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 46 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 24/6/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 01/04/1904
DON Doncaster 24/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 05/06/1928
   Withdrawn 19/06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 853)
07/03/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 846)
25/01/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1113)
01/06/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1269)
15/01/1921 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1410)
10/03/1928 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1402)
1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)
16/05/1931 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 912)
16/05/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
10/02/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
19/08/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
29/11/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
18/03/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 145)
28/06/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 07/03/1908   General
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1913 25/01/1913   General
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1918 01/06/1918   General
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1920 15/01/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1923 26/05/1923 92 days General  
Gorton Works 31/10/1925 26/12/1925 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5136
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1928 10/03/1928 64 days General
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 16/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1934 10/02/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 31/10/1936 15 days General  
Gorton Works 05/08/1939 19/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1941 29/11/1941 19 days General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1944 18/03/1944 20 days Heavy
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1945 26/05/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/06/1947 28/06/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 136
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4218
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
01/04/1904 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 07/03/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 25/01/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 01/06/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/12/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1920. Dep: 15/01/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1410 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
24/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 26/05/1923.    
24/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
31/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 26/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5136
   
07/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
05/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
1931 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 838 boiler fitted    
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
27/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.    
05/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3213    
07/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3213 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev