Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 137 m/e 01/1904
LNER (1924) 5137   26/09/1925
LNER (1946) 3214   24/03/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/101/1904
Q4/224/02/1923
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4219
To Service During 01/1904 to Barnsley (BRN)
Withdrawal Mon 16/05/1949 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRN Barnsley (New) m/e 01/1904
LNG Langwith Junction 23/09/1944
BRN Barnsley 07/04/1946
   Withdrawn 16/05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN BRN Barnsley 16/05/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 854)
07/07/1905 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number ???)
08/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 335)
08/02/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 857)
04/05/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 825)
24/02/1923 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1632)
21/06/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1691)
21/06/1930 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
01/04/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 319)
06/04/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)
21/11/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 910)
04/06/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)
09/10/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 906)
23/11/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1905 1 day General  
Gorton Works 1908 1 day General  
Gorton Works 1913 08/02/1913   General
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1918 04/05/1918   General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1922 24/02/1923 134 days General
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1925 26/09/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5137
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1928 21/04/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 10/05/1930 21/06/1930 43 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 23/08/1930 22 days Light Repair
New R.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1930 24/01/1931 50 days General
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1933 01/04/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1935 06/04/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1936 21/11/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1938 04/06/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1940 11/01/1941 22 days General  
Gorton Works 27/09/1943 09/10/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1946 23/11/1946 57 days General
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 137
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4219
Allocated to Barnsley (BRN)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1905 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1905.    
07/07/1905 Modification Diagram 17Sat number ??? boiler fitted    
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908.    
08/1908 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 335 boiler fitted    
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 08/02/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 857 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 04/05/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1922. Dep: 24/02/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
08/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5137
   
25/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928.    
10/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
   
06/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1930. Dep: 24/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
   
25/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941.    
27/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3214    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
28/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3214 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev