Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 138 m/e 02/1904
LNER (1924) 5138   23/07/1927
LNER (1946) 3215   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9937   07/04/1946
BR 69937   21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1904
Q4/223/07/1927
Q1/208/09/1945
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4220
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal Mon 05/11/1956 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 52 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/11/56

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) 17/02/1922
BRN Barnsley 02/02/1928
ARD Ardsley 10/10/1929
MEX Mexborough 19/09/1945
DON Doncaster 25/08/1946
FRO Frodingham 28/09/1946
   Withdrawn 05/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   05/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 855)
28/09/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 837)
30/03/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 337)
07/06/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1364)
23/07/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 832)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
19/03/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 47)
21/07/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1916)
16/01/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 914)
03/04/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3741)
08/09/1945 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3753)
21/08/1948 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3745)
30/06/1951 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22984)
13/02/1954 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22992)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 28/09/1907   General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 30/03/1912   General
Boiler number 337 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 07/06/1919   General
Boiler number 1364 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 07/05/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1923 22/12/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 28/05/1927 23/07/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5138
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1929 05/10/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 05/03/1932 19/03/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1934 21/07/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1937 16/01/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1939 20/01/1940 22 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1943 03/04/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 30/06/1945 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 11/7/45.
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1948 21/08/1948 50 days General
Boiler number 3745 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69937
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1951 30/06/1951 29 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1954 13/02/1954 22 days General
Returned to UK 8/6/19
Boiler number 22992 (Diagram 17A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 138
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4220
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 28/09/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 30/03/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 337 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 07/06/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1364 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 07/05/1921.    
17/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
13/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.    
28/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5138
   
02/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
31/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929.    
10/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
05/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1937. Dep: 16/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
30/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940.    
17/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 30/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 11/7/45.
   
08/09/1945 Modification Diagram 17A number 3753 boiler fitted    
19/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3215 but not taken up    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9937    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
03/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3745 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69937
   
02/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A)
   
23/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 8/6/19
Boiler number 22992 (Diagram 17A)
   
05/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 69937 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev