Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 270 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2177 Week
» 20959 Month
» 269252 Year
» 1153633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 139 m/e 02/1904
LNER (1924) 5139   24/10/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1904
Q4/224/10/1925
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4221
To Service During 02/1904 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Sat 18/08/1934 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 30 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 02/1904
IMM Immingham 10/01/1930
KEA Keadby 11/06/1932
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
   Withdrawn 18/08/1934

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 856)
03/08/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 839)
20/05/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1273)
24/02/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1416)
09/06/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1832)
24/10/1925 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
27/07/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
28/12/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)
19/03/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 03/08/1907   General
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1911 20/05/1911   General
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 24/02/1917   General
Returned to UK 10/5/19
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1919 26/07/1919 36 days General  
Gorton Works 18/09/1920 13/11/1920 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1923 09/06/1923 85 days General
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1925 24/10/1925 120 days General
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5139
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 14/04/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 22/06/1929 27/07/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1929 28/12/1929 15 days General
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1932 19/03/1932 15 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 139
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4221
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 03/08/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 20/05/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 24/02/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 10/5/19
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
21/06/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1919. Dep: 26/07/1919.    
18/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1920. Dep: 13/11/1920.    
17/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 09/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5139
   
03/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928.    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
22/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/08/1934 Withdrawn Condemned as 5139 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev