Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 140 m/e 02/1904
LNER (1924) 5140   10/10/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1904
Q4/210/10/1925
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4222
To Service During 02/1904 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Sat 27/11/1937 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 33 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 02/1904
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
   Withdrawn 27/11/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 857)
07/12/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1114)
13/01/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1272)
14/04/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1677)
10/10/1925 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 640)
13/04/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 552)
14/03/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 906)
14/03/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
03/06/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 832)
21/12/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 895)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 07/12/1907   General
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 13/01/1912   General
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 14/04/1917   General
Returned to UK 16/7/19
Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1919 23/08/1919 29 days General  
Gorton Works 27/11/1920 15/01/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 24/02/1923 30/06/1923 127 days General  
Gorton Works 13/06/1925 10/10/1925 120 days General
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5140
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1928 17/03/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 09/03/1929 13/04/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1931 14/03/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1933 03/06/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1935 21/12/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 895 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 140
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4222
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 07/12/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 13/01/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 14/04/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 16/7/19
Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919.    
27/11/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1920. Dep: 15/01/1921.    
24/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923.    
13/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5140
   
04/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928.    
09/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
20/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 895 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/11/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5140 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev