Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2085 Week
» 9269 Month
» 317250 Year
» 1201631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 142 m/e 03/1904
LNER (1924) 5142   27/06/1925
LNER (1946) 3216   26/01/1946
BR 63216 w/e 24/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1904
Q4/227/06/1925
Q4/127/07/1946
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4223
To Service During 03/1904 to Barnsley (BRN)
Withdrawal Mon 05/09/1949 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 45 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRN Barnsley (New) m/e 03/1904
LNG Langwith Junction 21/09/1944
BRN Barnsley 07/04/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/09/1947
   Withdrawn 05/09/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 858)
28/03/1908 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
28/09/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 845)
24/11/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1711)
27/06/1925 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1407)
29/06/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
29/06/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 640)
21/02/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
18/11/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 892)
26/10/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 906)
04/12/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 908)
16/05/1942 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 920)
05/02/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3734)
27/07/1946 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 201)
24/07/1948 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 893)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 28/03/1908   General
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1912 28/09/1912   General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 24/11/1917   General
Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1922 24/02/1923 85 days General  
Gorton Works 21/02/1925 27/06/1925 127 days General
Boiler number 1407 (Diagram 4Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5142
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1927 11/02/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 25/05/1929 29/06/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1931 21/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1933 18/11/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 892 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1935 26/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1937 04/12/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1940 02/03/1940 22 days General  
Gorton Works 11/05/1942 16/05/1942 6 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1944 05/02/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1946 27/07/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1948 24/07/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63216
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 142
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4223
Allocated to Barnsley (BRN)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 28/03/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 28/09/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 24/11/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1922. Dep: 24/02/1923.    
21/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1925. Dep: 27/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1407 (Diagram 4Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5142
   
24/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928.    
25/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
07/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 892 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.    
11/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
26/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3216    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
22/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
03/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1948. Dep: 24/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63216
   
05/09/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 63216 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev