Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 143 m/e 03/1904
LNER (1924) 5143   17/04/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1904
Q4/226/11/1932
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4224
To Service During 03/1904 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Fri 17/11/1939 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 18/11/39

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 03/1904
DON Doncaster 03/12/1929
BRN Barnsley 27/01/1930
   Withdrawn 17/11/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 859)
10/12/1910 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1264)
31/05/1919 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1403)
15/12/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 312)
28/07/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 431)
30/11/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1902)
26/11/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1918)
29/12/1934 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
29/12/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 913)
31/07/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 370)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 10/12/1910   General
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1919 31/05/1919   General
Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 30/04/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 14/07/1923 15/12/1923 155 days General
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1926 17/04/1926 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5143
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1928 28/07/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1929 30/11/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1932 26/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1934 29/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 31/07/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 143
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4224
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 10/12/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 31/05/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 30/04/1921.    
14/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1926. Dep: 17/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5143
   
30/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 28/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
19/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 29/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/11/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 5143 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev