|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1910 | 10/12/1910 | General | Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1919 | 31/05/1919 | General | Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 4Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1921 | 30/04/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1923 | 15/12/1923 | 155 days | General | Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1926 | 17/04/1926 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5143 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1928 | 28/07/1928 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1932 | 26/11/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1934 | 29/12/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1937 | 31/07/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 143 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4224 Allocated to Keadby (KEA) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 10/12/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 31/05/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
12/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 30/04/1921. | ||
14/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
20/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1926. Dep: 17/04/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5143 |
||
30/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 28/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
02/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
03/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
19/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 29/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
10/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/11/1939 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5143 from Barnsley (BRN) |