Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 145 m/e 03/1904
LNER (1924) 5145   05/04/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1904
Q4/229/11/1930
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4226
To Service During 03/1904 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Mon 21/09/1936 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 32 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 03/1904
   Withdrawn 21/09/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 861)
1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 868)
10/05/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1271)
20/02/1915 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 929)
21/12/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1378)
05/04/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 442)
04/08/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1266)
29/11/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1903)
13/01/1934 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
13/01/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 1 day General
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1910 02/07/1910   General  
Gorton Works 1913 10/05/1913   General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1915 20/02/1915   General
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1918 21/12/1918 78 days General
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1921 20/08/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1923 05/04/1924 127 days General
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5145
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1925 31/12/1925 48 days General  
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 04/08/1928 22 days General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1930 29/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1933 13/01/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 145
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4226
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 02/07/1910.    
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 10/05/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 20/02/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/10/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1918. Dep: 21/12/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1921. Dep: 20/08/1921.    
01/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5145
   
14/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925.    
14/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 04/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
08/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
21/09/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 5145 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev