Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2870 Week
» 21652 Month
» 269945 Year
» 1154326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 146 m/e 03/1904
LNER (1924) 5146   17/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3217   02/02/1946
BR 63217 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1904
Q4/221/12/1935
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4227
To Service During 03/1904
Withdrawal Wed 14/03/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 47 yrs , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 21/12/1912
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/10/1926
MEX Mexborough 08/12/1926
ARD Ardsley 21/10/1936
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 30/06/1946
37A Ardsley 04/06/1950
   Withdrawn 14/03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   14/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 862)
21/09/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 856)
07/01/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
21/11/1916 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1650)
17/05/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1841)
03/11/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1832)
17/01/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 550)
13/05/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1902)
21/12/1935 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
21/12/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 916)
07/01/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1842)
01/11/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3730)
22/04/1944 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
22/12/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3722)
01/05/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3735)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1907 21/09/1907   General
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1911 07/01/1911   General
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1916 21/11/1916   General
Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1921 19/03/1921 57 days General
New R.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1923 17/05/1924 316 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5146
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1925 31/12/1925 48 days General  
Gorton Works 29/09/1928 03/11/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1930 17/01/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 13/05/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 21/12/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 916 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1938 07/01/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1941 01/11/1941 27 days General
Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1944 22/04/1944 12 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1945 22/12/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1948 01/05/1948 18 days General
Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63217
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 146
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4227
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 21/09/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 07/01/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
21/12/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 21/11/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 19/03/1921.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
   
07/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1923. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5146
   
14/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925.    
15/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
08/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
29/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 916 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
21/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
24/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
01/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3217    
30/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
14/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1948. Dep: 01/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63217
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
14/03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63217 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev