Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 147 m/e 03/1904
LNER (1924) 5147   25/10/1924
LNER (1946) 3218   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9935   27/01/1946
BR 69935   18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1904
Q4/218/11/1922
Q1/216/01/1945
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4228
To Service During 03/1904 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Thu 03/09/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 55 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 26/9/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 03/1904
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 27/08/1939
ARD Ardsley 02/12/1941
DON Doncaster 25/08/1946
FRO Frodingham 26/09/1946
   Withdrawn 03/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   03/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 863)
10/04/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)
05/09/1914 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1369)
18/08/1917 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1701)
18/11/1922 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1634)
02/05/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
02/05/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 643)
24/02/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
01/08/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
31/12/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 47)
16/05/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
16/01/1945 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3755)
18/09/1948 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3753)
11/08/1951 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22985)
20/03/1954 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22984)
31/08/1957 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22982)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1909 10/04/1909   General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1914 05/09/1914   General
Boiler number 1369 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1917 18/08/1917   General
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1922 18/11/1922 176 days General
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 25/10/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5147
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1927 25/06/1927 176 days General  
Gorton Works 17/09/1929 28/09/1929 12 days General
New L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1931 02/05/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1934 24/02/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 01/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1938 31/12/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1942 16/05/1942 20 days General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1943 06/11/1943 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1944 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 5/45.
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1948 18/09/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3753 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69935
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1951 11/08/1951 68 days General
Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1954 20/03/1954 35 days General
Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1954 02/04/1954 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/07/1957 31/08/1957 58 days General
Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1957 14/09/1957 12 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 147
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4228
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 10/04/1909.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 05/09/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1369 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 18/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5147
   
01/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927.    
17/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
   
04/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
03/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
02/12/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
27/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943.    
28/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 28/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 5/45.
   
16/01/1945 Modification Diagram 17A number 3755 boiler fitted    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3218 but not taken up    
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9935    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
28/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3753 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69935
   
05/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A)
   
14/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A)
   
23/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954.    
05/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A)
   
03/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/09/1957. Dep: 14/09/1957.    
03/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69935 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev