Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 148 m/e 04/1904
LNER (1924) 5148   19/12/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/104/1904
Q4/229/02/1936
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4229
To Service During 04/1904 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Sat 29/10/1938 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 34 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 04/1904
DON Doncaster m/e 04/1929
ARD Ardsley 21/08/1936
   Withdrawn 29/10/1938

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 864)
23/04/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 840)
11/03/1916 Diagram 12A boiler fitted (number LT20)
16/04/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1269)
20/10/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
02/03/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1679)
01/08/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
07/10/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 550)
29/02/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 145)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 23/04/1910   General
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1916 11/03/1916   General
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 12A)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1921 16/04/1921 78 days General
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1923 20/10/1923 176 days General
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1925 19/12/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5148
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1929 02/03/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1931 01/08/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1933 07/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1936 19/02/1936 5 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 148
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4229
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 23/04/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 11/03/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 12A)
   
29/01/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1269 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
28/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 20/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1925. Dep: 19/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5148
   
05/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
30/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 19/02/1936.    
29/02/1936 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 145 boiler fitted    
21/08/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
29/10/1938 Withdrawn Condemned as 5148 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev