Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 149 m/e 04/1904
LNER (1924) 5149   06/09/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4230
To Service During 04/1904 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Sat 09/12/1939 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 16/12/39

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 04/1904
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/10/1926
MEX Mexborough 07/12/1926
BRN Barnsley 05/09/1929
   Withdrawn 09/12/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 865)
23/06/1908 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 858)
04/09/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 863)
10/11/1917 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
06/09/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1138)
10/08/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 19)
21/11/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 522)
10/03/1934 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
10/03/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
27/06/1936 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 46A)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 23/06/1908   General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1909 04/09/1909   General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 10/11/1917   General
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1922 29/07/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 06/09/1924 162 days General
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5149
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1927 05/03/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 13/07/1929 08/1929   General  
Gorton Works 31/10/1931 21/11/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1934 10/03/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1936 27/06/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 149
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4230
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 23/06/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 04/09/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 10/11/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922.    
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5149
   
15/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
07/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
08/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1927. Dep: 05/03/1927.    
13/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: ?/08/1929.    
10/08/1929 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 19 boiler fitted    
05/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
31/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 10/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
06/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/12/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 5149 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev