|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1908 | 23/06/1908 | General | Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1909 | 04/09/1909 | General | Boiler number 863 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1917 | 10/11/1917 | General | Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1922 | 29/07/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1924 | 06/09/1924 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5149 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1927 | 05/03/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1929 | 08/1929 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1931 | 21/11/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1934 | 10/03/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 149 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4230 Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 23/06/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 04/09/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 863 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 10/11/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922. | ||
29/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5149 |
||
15/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
07/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
08/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1927. Dep: 05/03/1927. | ||
13/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: ?/08/1929. | ||
10/08/1929 | Modification | Diagram 17Sat number 19 boiler fitted | ||
05/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
31/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
17/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 10/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 129 (Diagram 17Sat) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
06/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/12/1939 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5149 from Barnsley (BRN) |