|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1910 | 12/11/1910 | General | Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1913 | 08/11/1913 | General | Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1920 | 01/01/1921 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1376 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1923 | 21/04/1923 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1925 | 16/05/1925 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5150 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1927 | 10/12/1927 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1929 | 13/04/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1934 | 31/03/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1936 | 15/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 150 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4231 Allocated to Keadby (KEA) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 12/11/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 08/11/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
27/11/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1920. Dep: 01/01/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1376 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
10/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1923. Dep: 21/04/1923. | ||
07/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1925. Dep: 16/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5150 |
||
24/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
16/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929. | ||
01/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
10/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
01/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/03/1939 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5150 from Frodingham (FRO) |