Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 388 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6197 Week
» 13381 Month
» 321362 Year
» 1205743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 150 m/e 04/1904
LNER (1924) 5150   16/05/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/104/1904
Q4/201/01/1921
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4231
To Service During 04/1904 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Mon 06/03/1939 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 34 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 04/1904
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
   Withdrawn 06/03/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 866)
12/11/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1263)
08/11/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1266)
01/01/1921 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1376)
10/12/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 842)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
29/08/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)
31/03/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 419)
15/08/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 12/11/1910   General
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1913 08/11/1913   General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1920 01/01/1921 36 days General
Boiler number 1376 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1923 21/04/1923 43 days General  
Gorton Works 07/02/1925 16/05/1925 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5150
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1927 10/12/1927 78 days General
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1929 13/04/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 01/08/1931 29/08/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1934 31/03/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1936 15/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 150
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4231
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 12/11/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 08/11/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/11/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1920. Dep: 01/01/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1376 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1923. Dep: 21/04/1923.    
07/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1925. Dep: 16/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5150
   
24/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929.    
01/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
10/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
01/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/03/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 5150 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev