Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 1019 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3118 Week
» 14689 Month
» 262982 Year
» 1147363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 151 m/e 05/1904
LNER (1924) 5151   12/12/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/105/1904
Q4/214/08/1915
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4232
To Service During 05/1904 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Tue 16/05/1939 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 35 yrs , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 05/1904
DON Doncaster m/e 07/1907
MAR March 02/02/1927
IMM Immingham 08/03/1929
KEA Keadby 13/06/1929
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
   Withdrawn 16/05/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 867)
07/07/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
14/08/1915 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1404)
01/01/1921 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 860)
12/12/1925 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 647)
12/01/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
30/05/1931 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1402)
30/05/1931 Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
21/04/1934 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 912)
21/04/1934 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
10/10/1936 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 837)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1909 07/1909   General  
Gorton Works 1912 02/11/1912   General  
Gorton Works 1915 14/08/1915   General
Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1920 01/01/1921 57 days General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1923 12/05/1923 78 days General  
Gorton Works 10/10/1925 12/12/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5151
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1928 12/01/1929 43 days General
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1931 30/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1934 21/04/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1936 10/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 151
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4232
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
07/1907 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/07/1909.    
07/07/1909 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 852 boiler fitted    
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 02/11/1912.    
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 14/08/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1404 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
06/11/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1920. Dep: 01/01/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 12/05/1923.    
10/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5151
   
02/02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
01/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 12/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
08/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
09/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1402 (Diagram 4Sat)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
26/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/05/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 5151 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev