|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1908 | 08/08/1908 | General | Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1912 | 21/12/1912 | General | Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1917 | 22/12/1917 | General | Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1922 | 27/01/1923 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 1411 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5152 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1927 | 04/02/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 27/12/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1933 | 24/06/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1940 | 08/02/1941 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1943 | 06/02/1943 | 23 days | General | New cylinders Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to GCR Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1946 | 08/06/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 152 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4233 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 08/08/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 21/12/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
01/02/1913 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 22/12/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
02/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1411 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
19/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5152 |
||
02/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
24/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
10/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
28/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
11/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
05/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
06/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
15/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943. Work undertaken: New cylinders Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to GCR Gauge |
||
05/1943 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
30/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3219 | ||
01/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946. | ||
14/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
26/12/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3219 from Barnsley (BRN) |