Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 152 m/e 05/1904
LNER (1924) 5152   22/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3219   10/02/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/105/1904
Q4/220/01/1945
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4233
To Service During 05/1904
Withdrawal Mon 26/12/1949 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 45 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 31/12/49

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 01/02/1913
DON Doncaster 02/04/1924
MAR March 18/07/1925
LNG Langwith Junction 02/03/1929
ARD Ardsley 28/02/1934
BRN Barnsley 06/12/1940
   Withdrawn 26/12/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN BRN Barnsley 26/12/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 868)
08/08/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 853)
21/12/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 854)
22/12/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1367)
27/01/1923 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1411)
04/02/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)
27/12/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 46A)
24/06/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1138)
25/05/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
05/03/1938 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 431)
08/02/1941 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
08/02/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 876)
06/02/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)
06/02/1943 Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
05/1943 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
20/01/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
18/01/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 185)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 08/08/1908   General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 21/12/1912   General
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 22/12/1917   General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1922 27/01/1923 148 days General
Boiler number 1411 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1924 22/03/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5152
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1927 04/02/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1930 27/12/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1933 24/06/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1935 25/05/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1938 05/03/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1940 08/02/1941 92 days General
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1943 06/02/1943 23 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1944 20/01/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1946 08/06/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 14/12/1946 18/01/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 152
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4233
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 08/08/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 21/12/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/02/1913 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 22/12/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1411 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
19/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5152
   
02/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
24/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
29/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 27/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
28/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
06/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
15/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
   
05/1943 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
30/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3219    
01/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946.    
14/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
26/12/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3219 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev