Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 153 m/e 05/1904
LNER (1924) 5153   25/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3220   09/02/1946
BR 63220 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/105/1904
Q4/226/12/1914
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4234
To Service During 05/1904 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Wed 14/03/1951 off Barnsley (36D)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 17/3/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 05/1904
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
BRN Barnsley 09/08/1943
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 14/03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
WDN   14/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1904 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
30/10/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)
26/12/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 862)
24/07/1920 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1406)
23/07/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 831)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
06/12/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 165)
18/01/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 651)
25/06/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3721)
22/05/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 650)
09/02/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
20/11/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3722)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1909 30/10/1909   General
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1914 26/12/1914   General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 24/07/1920   General
Boiler number 1406 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1922 23/12/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 07/02/1925 25/04/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5153
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 23/07/1927 85 days General
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1929 29/06/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 15/11/1930 06/12/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 06/05/1933 57 days General
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1935 18/01/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1938 25/06/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1941 01/02/1941 22 days General  
Gorton Works 08/05/1943 22/05/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1946 09/02/1946 24 days General
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3220
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 25/05/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/11/1948 20/11/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63220
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 153
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4234
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 30/10/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 26/12/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 24/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1406 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
21/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922.    
07/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5153
   
30/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
11/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929.    
15/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
   
28/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941.    
08/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
17/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3220
   
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946.    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
06/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63220
   
14/03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63220 from Barnsley (36D)    

prev prev