Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1073 m/e 07/1905
LNER (1924) 6073   16/07/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4335
To Service During 07/1905 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Tue 10/12/1935 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 14/12/35

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 07/1905
ARD Ardsley 15/10/1927
KEA Keadby 16/10/1929
ARD Ardsley 01/04/1930
   Withdrawn 10/12/1935

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1905 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1110)
09/03/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 478)
07/04/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1682)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
01/10/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 894)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1912 09/03/1912   General
Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 07/04/1917   General
Returned to UK 20/6/19
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1919 23/08/1919 36 days General  
Gorton Works 06/08/1921 08/10/1921 64 days General  
Gorton Works 15/09/1923 22/12/1923 99 days General  
Gorton Works 29/01/1927 16/07/1927 169 days General
Superheater installed
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6073
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1929 01/02/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 17/09/1932 01/10/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 1073
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4335
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 09/03/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 478 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 07/04/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 20/6/19
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919.    
06/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1921. Dep: 08/10/1921.    
15/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.    
29/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927.
Work undertaken:
Superheater installed
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6073
   
15/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
16/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
28/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930.    
01/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
17/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/12/1935 Withdrawn Condemned as 6073 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev