Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 153 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 153 Week
» 18935 Month
» 267228 Year
» 1151609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1075 m/e 08/1905
LNER (1924) 6075   24/04/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4337
To Service During 08/1905
Withdrawal Sat 06/01/1940 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 14/12/1912
DON Doncaster 15/12/1923
MEX Mexborough 26/03/1925
ARD Ardsley 05/03/1929
   Withdrawn 06/01/1940

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1905 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1112)
14/05/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 867)
07/10/1916 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1646)
10/11/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 201)
16/02/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 442)
05/12/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 19)
02/02/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 431)
02/10/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 530)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 14/05/1910   General
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1916 07/10/1916   General
Returned to UK 10/5/19
Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1919 02/08/1919 36 days General  
Gorton Works 19/02/1921 19/03/1921 29 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1923 10/11/1923 197 days General
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1926 24/04/1926 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6075
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1928 16/02/1929 92 days General
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1931 05/12/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 02/02/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 02/10/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 1075
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4337
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 14/05/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/12/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 07/10/1916.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 10/5/19
Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
28/06/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1919. Dep: 02/08/1919.    
19/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 19/03/1921.    
28/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/12/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 24/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6075
   
17/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1928. Dep: 16/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
14/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/01/1940 Withdrawn Condemned as 6075 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev