|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1910 | 24/12/1910 | General | Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1917 | 28/04/1917 | General | Returned to UK 5/6/19 Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 12/07/1919 | 23/08/1919 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1921 | 06/08/1921 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6076 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1930 | 08/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 43 days | General | New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1934 | 10/11/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 19 days | Heavy | New L.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1945 | 18/08/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | Secondhand L.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1948 | 24/01/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3221 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1076 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4338 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 24/12/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 28/04/1917. Work undertaken: Returned to UK 5/6/19 Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
12/07/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919. | ||
08/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
07/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1921. Dep: 06/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
24/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. | ||
02/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6076 |
||
13/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
10/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
01/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. | ||
22/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. Work undertaken: New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
13/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1940. | ||
15/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. Work undertaken: New L.H. cylinder |
||
28/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Secondhand L.H. cylinder |
||
16/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3221 | ||
10/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 24/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3221 |
||
26/12/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3221 from Ardsley (37A) |