Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 192 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 192 Week
» 18974 Month
» 267267 Year
» 1151648 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1076 m/e 08/1905
LNER (1924) 6076   04/07/1925
LNER (1946) 3221   16/09/1946
BR (Tmp) E3221   24/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/108/1905
Q4/229/10/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4338
To Service During 08/1905
Withdrawal Tue 26/12/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 30/12/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 08/11/1919
KEA Keadby m/e 1922
ARD Ardsley 11/11/1927
KEA Keadby 10/10/1929
ARD Ardsley 22/03/1930
   Withdrawn 26/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1905 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1113)
24/12/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1110)
28/04/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 866)
06/08/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1270)
29/10/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1650)
04/07/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1634)
10/11/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 370)
10/11/1934 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
27/02/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 643)
06/05/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 911)
18/08/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 899)
24/01/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 24/12/1910   General
Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 28/04/1917   General
Returned to UK 5/6/19
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1919 23/08/1919 43 days General  
Gorton Works 07/05/1921 06/08/1921 92 days General
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1923 14/04/1923 50 days General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 04/07/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6076
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 29/10/1927 78 days General
Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1930 08/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 23/05/1931 04/07/1931 43 days General
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1934 10/11/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1937 27/02/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1939 06/05/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1940 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 15/06/1943 03/07/1943 19 days Heavy
New L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1945 18/08/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1946 30/03/1946 22 days Light Repair
Secondhand L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1948 24/01/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3221
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 1076
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4338
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 24/12/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 28/04/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 5/6/19
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
12/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919.    
08/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
07/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1921. Dep: 06/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1922 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
24/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923.    
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6076
   
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
01/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930.    
22/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
23/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
13/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1940.    
15/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
   
28/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Secondhand L.H. cylinder
   
16/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3221    
10/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 24/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3221
   
26/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3221 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev