Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1077 m/e 08/1905
LNER (1924) 6077   18/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3222   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9930   26/05/1946
BR 69930   19/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/108/1905
Q4/208/04/1916
Q4/130/11/1940
Q1/211/12/1943
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4339
To Service During 08/1905
Withdrawal Thu 02/10/1958 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 53 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 4/10/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction 20/06/1914
MEX Mexborough 05/06/1937
LNG Langwith Junction 13/02/1944
IMM Immingham 09/05/1944
MEX Mexborough 13/09/1944
DON Doncaster 25/08/1946
FRO Frodingham 24/09/1946
30A Stratford 16/04/1950
36C Frodingham 27/08/1950
   Withdrawn 02/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 16/04/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 27/08/1950
WDN   02/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1905 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1114)
04/01/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
12/08/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 843)
08/04/1916 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1610)
06/05/1922 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1415)
04/02/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 897)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
15/10/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)
22/12/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 650)
13/02/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 891)
30/11/1940 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 431)
11/12/1943 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3743)
15/02/1947 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3764)
19/11/1949 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3744)
06/09/1952 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22990)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1908 04/01/1908   General
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1909 12/08/1909   General
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1916 08/04/1916   General
Boiler number 1610 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1922 06/05/1922 57 days General
Boiler number 1415 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1923 20/10/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 21/02/1925 18/04/1925 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6077
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 04/02/1928 78 days General
Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1930 26/04/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/10/1932 15/10/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1934 22/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1937 13/02/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1940 30/11/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Doncaster Works 01/10/1943 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Woodford as a water carrier 6/1l/43
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1947 15/02/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3764 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1949 19/11/1949 43 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69930
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1952 06/09/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 22990 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1952 17/09/1952 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/04/1955 14/05/1955 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 17/05/1955 18/05/1955 2 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1905 To Service To service as GCR Number 1077
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4339
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 04/01/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: 12/08/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/06/1914 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 08/04/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1610 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1922. Dep: 06/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1415 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1923. Dep: 20/10/1923.    
21/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6077
   
19/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
22/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930.    
08/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
08/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
26/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 01/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Woodford as a water carrier 6/1l/43
   
11/12/1943 Modification Diagram 17A number 3743 boiler fitted    
13/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
09/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3222 but not taken up    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9930    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
24/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3764 (Diagram 17A)
   
08/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69930
   
16/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
10/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22990 (Diagram 17A)
   
09/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1952. Dep: 17/09/1952.    
01/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955.    
17/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 18/05/1955.    
02/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69930 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev