Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 415 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1352 Week
» 8536 Month
» 316517 Year
» 1200898 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1132 m/e 02/1907
LNER (1924) 6132   05/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3223   06/10/1946
BR 63223 w/e 10/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1907
Q4/203/03/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4475
To Service During 02/1907
Withdrawal Mon 11/06/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 16/6/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction 09/04/1920
CLK Colwick 21/02/1934
ARD Ardsley 07/10/1935
   Withdrawn 11/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   11/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1262)
28/03/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 195)
24/01/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1832)
07/04/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 418)
03/03/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 319)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
28/01/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1678)
27/07/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 525)
12/02/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 138)
26/10/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 728)
28/11/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 832)
21/04/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3735)
10/04/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3741)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 28/03/1914   General
Boiler number 195 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 24/01/1920   General
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1921 14/01/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 24/02/1923 07/04/1923 43 days General
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1924 05/07/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6132
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1925 23/01/1926 64 days General  
Gorton Works 21/01/1928 03/03/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1928 23/06/1928 15 days Light Repair
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1930 02/08/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 28/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1935 27/07/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1938 12/02/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1940 26/10/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1942 28/11/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1945 21/04/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1945 28/07/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/03/1948 10/04/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63223
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1132
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4475
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 28/03/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 195 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 24/01/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/04/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
12/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1921. Dep: 14/01/1922.    
24/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 07/04/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6132
   
21/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 23/01/1926.    
21/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1928. Dep: 03/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
28/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930.    
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 28/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
05/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945.    
06/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3223    
13/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63223
   
11/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63223 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev