Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 529 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 21218 Month
» 269511 Year
» 1153892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1133 m/e 02/1907
LNER (1924) 6133   03/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3224   29/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1907
Q4/220/05/1922
Q4/120/06/1944
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4476
To Service During 02/1907
Withdrawal Sat 26/02/1949 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 42 yrs , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction 07/11/1914
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
ARD Ardsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 26/02/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 05/10/1947
WDN ARD Ardsley 26/02/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1263)
24/09/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1274)
03/10/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1377)
20/04/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 854)
20/05/1922 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1413)
10/07/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
10/05/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 650)
19/03/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 553)
22/09/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1920)
13/02/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1901)
20/01/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)
22/08/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 908)
20/06/1944 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 920)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 24/09/1910   General
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1914 03/10/1914   General
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1918 20/04/1918   General
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1922 20/05/1922 57 days General
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 03/05/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6133
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1926 10/07/1926 169 days General
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1928 28/04/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 12/04/1930 10/05/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1932 19/03/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1934 22/09/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1937 13/02/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1940 20/01/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1942 22/08/1942 30 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1944 20/06/1944 11 days Heavy
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1946 09/11/1946 22 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1133
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4476
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 24/09/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 03/10/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/11/1914 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 20/04/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 20/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6133
   
23/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928.    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
12/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
01/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
10/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/06/1944. Dep: 20/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
29/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3224    
19/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
26/02/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3224 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev