|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1910 | 24/09/1910 | General | Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1914 | 03/10/1914 | General | Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1918 | 20/04/1918 | General | Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1922 | 20/05/1922 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 03/05/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6133 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1926 | 10/07/1926 | 169 days | General | Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1928 | 28/04/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1930 | 10/05/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1932 | 19/03/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1934 | 22/09/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1937 | 13/02/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1940 | 20/01/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 30 days | General | New cylinders Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1944 | 20/06/1944 | 11 days | Heavy | Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 22 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1133 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4476 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 24/09/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 03/10/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
07/11/1914 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 20/04/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 854 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
25/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 20/05/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6133 |
||
23/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928. | ||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
12/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
05/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
01/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 20/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: New cylinders Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
10/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/06/1944. Dep: 20/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 920 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
29/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3224 | ||
19/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
26/02/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3224 from Ardsley (ARD) |