Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 417 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1354 Week
» 8538 Month
» 316519 Year
» 1200900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1134 m/e 02/1907
LNER (1924) 6134   04/10/1924
LNER (1946) 3225   08/10/1946
BR 63225 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1907
Q4/208/01/1916
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4477
To Service During 02/1907
Withdrawal Tue 25/09/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 04/02/1916
LNG Langwith Junction 09/02/1924
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
NWE New England 12/12/1943
NWE New England (M&GNR) 27/08/1944
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28/10/1945
GRA Grantham 01/09/1946
ARD Ardsley 22/04/1947
   Withdrawn 25/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 22/04/1947
WDN   25/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1907 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1264)
23/07/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1112)
09/03/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 237)
08/01/1916 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 865)
04/10/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 589)
07/07/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1903)
10/1930 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
01/11/1930 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
17/12/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
09/02/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 646)
12/08/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)
26/06/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3726)
06/11/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3742)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 23/07/1910   General
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1912 09/03/1912   General
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1915 08/01/1916 288 days General
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1921 11/03/1922 106 days General  
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 04/10/1924 197 days General
Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6134
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 13/02/1926 57 days General  
Gorton Works 19/05/1928 07/07/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1930 01/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 17/12/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 09/02/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 646 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 10/04/1937 22 days General  
Gorton Works 22/07/1939 12/08/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1941 19/04/1941 15 days General  
Gorton Works 05/08/1941 30/08/1941 26 days General  
Gorton Works 08/06/1943 26/06/1943 19 days General
Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1945 1 day Tender only  
Gorton Works 09/03/1946 06/04/1946 29 days General  
Gorton Works 16/10/1948 06/11/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63225
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1134
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4477
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 23/07/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 09/03/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/03/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1915. Dep: 08/01/1916.
Work undertaken:
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/02/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1921. Dep: 11/03/1922.    
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 04/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6134
   
19/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926.    
19/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1928. Dep: 07/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/1930 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
11/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 17/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 09/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 646 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937.    
22/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941.    
05/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941.    
08/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE) (M&GNR)    
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Tender only) - Arr: 30/06/1945.    
28/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.    
01/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
08/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3225    
22/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63225
   
25/09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63225 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev